WOOLPIT AND DISTRICT MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To display artefacts and information pertaining to woolpit and the surrounding district . Displayed in local museum
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 30 December 1996: Standard registration
- WOOLPIT MUSEUM (Working name)
- WOOLPIT AND DISTRICT MUSEUM TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- WOOLPIT MUSEUM TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Evelyn Vera Ayling | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rita Burr | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.56k | £100 | £357 | £552 | £419 | |
|
Total expenditure | £570 | £70 | £175 | £137 | £112 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 11TH NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF THE MUSEUM COMPRISING THE EXISTING COLLECTION TOGETHER WITH SUCH OTHER EXHIBITS OR ITEMS AS MAY FROM TIME BE COMPRISED IN THE TRUST FUND AND TO PRESERVE THE SAME AS A COLLECTION.
Area of benefit
WOOLPIT AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Swan Lake
Old Stowmarket Road
Woolpit
Bury St. Edmunds
IP30 9QS
- Phone:
- 07719711204
- Email:
- MARTINBAKER43@HOTMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window