Financial history SOUTH EAST COAST AMBULANCE SERVICE CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1059933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.00k £205.00k £25.00k £456.00k £99.00k
Total expenditure £27.00k £164.00k £147.00k £192.00k £303.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A