DARSHILL AND BOWLISH CONSERVATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manages Conservation Society land; fosters interest in, and preservation of, local natural and built environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 31 December 1996: Standard registration
- DARSHILL CONSERVATION SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alastair Petfield | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Edward Jenkin | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Victor Fisher | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR LETHABY | Trustee | 13 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY DORRINGTON | Trustee | 02 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN YEO | Trustee | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.06k | £1.90k | £8.00k | £5.76k | £1.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.44k | £1.67k | £18.07k | £6.21k | £579 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 March 2025 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 JULY 1996 AS AMENDED 15 APRIL 2000 as amended on 02 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
1) PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE 2) EDUCATE PUBLIC IN GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE 3) SECURE THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF INTEREST
Area of benefit
DARSHILL AND BOWLISH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marechiaro
Ham Lane
Bowlish
Shepton Mallet
BA4 5JW
- Phone:
- 01749344154
- Email:
- eddie.oram@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window