Financial history THE WHARTON TRUST

Charity Number: 1059956
Charity reporting is up to date (89 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £316.58k £525.14k £339.06k £484.32k £420.82k
Total expenditure £273.29k £267.41k £300.52k £307.31k £338.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.90k £52.47k £261.91k £14.35k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £513.91k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £11.23k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £267.41k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A