CYMDEITHAS NEUADD PENRHOSLLIGWY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provision of facilities in village hall for the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 02 January 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DERLWYN HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALWYN ROWLANDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARWYN RICHARD HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OWEN THOMAS HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.46k | £11.71k | £225 | £68 | £2.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.99k | £2.14k | £2.00k | £4.19k | £2.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 410 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MARCH 1996 AS AMENDED 14 NOVEMBER 1996, AS AMENDED 12 MAY 2008.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PENRHOSLLIGWY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
PENRHOSLLIGWY YNYS MON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Derwen Villa
Mill Garage
Dulas
Anglesey
LL70 9DZ
- Phone:
- 01248410586
- Email:
- GRIFFITHS04@BTINTERNET.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window