TRAINING AND PERFORMANCE SHOWCASE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To seek out, train and showcase emerging talented writers by putting their original voices in front of leading Drama and Comedy producers, script executives and the public. TAPS aims to unearth new writers who may not otherwise be noticed and help them develop better scripts through workshops and mentoring. TAPS aim is to make the scheme as accessible as possible to the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 January 1997: Standard registration
- 31 January 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- T A P S (Working name)
- TELEVISION ARTS PERFORMANCE SHOWCASE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £409.09k | £347.05k | £318.28k | £314.15k | £182.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £411.18k | £338.69k | £263.01k | £259.76k | £246.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 10 June 2011 | 130 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH AUGUST 1996
Charitable objects
TO EQUIP NEW SCRIPT WRITERS WITH THE NECESSARY SKILLS TO HELP THEM INCREASE THEIR OPPORTUNITIES FOR EMPLOYMENT WITHIN THE TELEVISION INDUSTRY; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF DRAMA BY SHOWCASING THE WORK OF NEW WRITERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window