GRANTHAM AND DISTRICT POVERTY CONCERN GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty by providing meals at various drop in centres and making small emergency loans
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 07 January 1997: Standard registration
- GRANTHAM POVERTY CONCERN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sheila Knight | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Patricia Marion Temple-Fielder | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Annie May Walker | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Maureen Griffiths | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Robert Cameron | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Esme Sutton | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Lindsay Whittle | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Maddison | Trustee | 17 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||
David Scott Lynn | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.86k | £31.06k | £51.66k | £29.95k | £30.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.95k | £16.47k | £44.59k | £28.24k | £38.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | £2.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 December 2023 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 December 2023 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 27 AUG 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND OF ELDERLY PERSONS IN GRANTHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Area of benefit
GRANTHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
142 HARROWBY ROAD
GRANTHAM
NG31 9DU
- Phone:
- 01476402161
- Email:
- david.lynn142@mail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window