Financial history RUGRATS - BUCKLAND DINHAM

Charity number: 1060026
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £2.57k £2.07k £1.95k £2.51k £2.08k
Total expenditure £2.62k £1.80k £2.13k £3.08k £2.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A