Accounts and annual returns ROPSLEY C.E. PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1060032
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2013 06 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2012 13 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not Required