THE GRASSROOTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Area of operation: Worldwide Activities: Seeking to advance the Kingdom of God, wherever He calls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Egypt
- India
- Kenya
- Kyrgyzstan
- Malawi
- Peru
- Romania
- Scotland
- Spain
- Tanzania
- Zambia
Governance
- 09 January 1997: Standard registration
- 09 March 2020: Funds received from 326207 THE GRASSROOTS CHRISTIAN TRUST
- MOUTHPEACE (Working name)
- WALK THE WALLS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Raymond John Price | Chair | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Rawding | Trustee | 22 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Corley | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Cameron Walker | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert Clive Sweatman | Trustee |
|
||||||
Stuart David Howard Boreham | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR ROB ANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £393.76k | £459.46k | £446.97k | £443.68k | £470.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £418.30k | £440.12k | £469.14k | £496.28k | £447.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20/12/1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17/01/2015
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE APPENDED TO THE CHARITY'S DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 DECEMBER 1996 (B) TO RELIEVE POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 MEADOW WAY
ROWLEDGE
FARNHAM
GU10 4DY
- Phone:
- 01252792387
- Email:
- admin@grassroots.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window