Financial history Black Country Healthcare Charity Fund

Charity Number: 1060039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.54k £233.83k £60.29k £12.12k £89.78k
Total expenditure £40.42k £85.13k £103.00k £53.30k £103.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A