THE ST LAWRENCE'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MANAGEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A FORMER CHURCH FOR COMMUNITY BENEFIT FOR CONCERTS, CLASSES, EXHIBITIONS ETC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 09 January 1997: Standard registration
- ST LAWRENCES CENTRE (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nina Julia Murray | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Walter John Murray | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kevin Billson | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Hitchcock | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
NICKY ARROWSMITH-BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.78k | £4.05k | £6.53k | £11.79k | £12.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.56k | £5.22k | £4.95k | £10.91k | £12.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 DECEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 28TH NOVEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
FOR ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF NORFOLK AND THE DIOCESE OF NORWICH:- (A) TO PRESERVE, REPAIR, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT THE CHURCH OF ST LAWRENCE SOUTH WALSHAM IN THE DIOCESE OF NORWICH ITS CHURCHYARD AND ITS MONUMENTS FITTINGS FIXTURES GLASS FURNITURE ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS AS A BUILDING OF HISTORICAL IMPORTANCE OR ARCHITECTURAL VALUE (B) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE WHICH (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THOSE WORDS) MAY INCLUDE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS
Area of benefit
NORFOLK AND THE DIOCESE OF NORWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Post Office Close
South Walsham
NORWICH
NR13 6FA
- Phone:
- 01603270909
- Email:
- ken.jennings@BTINTERNET.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window