WILLIAM TYNDALE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises funds and makes grants in support of capital projects and educational initiatives for William Tyndale Primary School in central Islington.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Islington
Governance
- 10 January 1997: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR JONATHAN NORDEN WEBER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CLAIRE DAVIES | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS BECKY CRICHTON-MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.33k | £2.81k | £2.70k | £3.70k | £3.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78 | £30.33k | £78 | £491 | £98 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 04 September 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 21 September 2020 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF WILLIAM TYNDALE PRIMARY SCHOOL:(A) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE GOVERNING BODY AND STAFF OF THE SCHOOL, AND (B) PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
ISLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
William Tyndale Primary School
Upper Street
LONDON
N1 2GG
- Phone:
- 02072266803
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window