THE FOREST STEWARDSHIP COUNCIL UK WORKING GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FSC is an independent, non-profit, non-governmental organisation. It has developed a unique system of independent forest certification and product labelling which enables consumers to identify timber and timber products from responsibly managed woodlands around the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 January 1997: Standard registration
- 14 June 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 14 June 2010: Funds transferred to 1130203 EPHESEA UK
- F S C U K (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2005 | 28/02/2006 | 28/02/2007 | 29/02/2008 | 30/04/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.97k | £275.48k | £135.01k | £315.15k | £221.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.57k | £238.37k | £195.37k | £324.52k | £199.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | 17 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | 29 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 29 February 2008 | 20 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2008 | 26 September 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2007 | 03 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2007 | 03 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2006 | 18 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2006 | 18 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2005 | 21 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2005 | 13 October 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 DECEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED 5 JULY 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PROTECTION AND CONSERVATION OF THE WORLD'S FORESTS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: (I)INTRODUCING A PROGRAMME OF VOLUNTARY ACCREDITATION OF FOREST CERTIFICATION BODIES. (II)DEVELOPING CONSENSUS AROUND STANDARDS FOR GOOD FOREST MANAGEMENT. (III)INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS ABOUT INDEPENDENT FOREST CERTIFICATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window