THE JONATHAN FALCONER CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for research peojects and dissemination of information regarding Sudden Infant Death
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 11 January 1997: Standard registration
- 14 September 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 14 September 2019: Funds transferred to 1160661 ALDER HEY CHILDREN'S CHARITY
- JFCT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50 | £991 | £61 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 21 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 08 August 2017 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 DECEMBER 1996.
Charitable objects
1)TO ASSIST IN THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH OF YOUNG CHILDREN OR BABIES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST EQUIPMENT AND OTHER SERVICES NOT PROVIDED BY THE N.H.S. 2)TO ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH PROJECTS NOT FUNDED BY THE N.H.S. WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE UNDERSTANDING OF THE CAUSES OF SUDDEN DEATH IN INFANTS AND TO DISSEMINATE RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window