THE VILLAGE HALL BRANSTON
Charity number: 1060096
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General fund raising for the village hall by dog shows, bike ride, charity support etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 11 January 1997: Standard registration
- 29 May 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- BRANSTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 22 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 22 January 2020 | 356 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 23 February 2018 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 20 NOVEMBER 1972.
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BRANSTON.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISH OF BRANSTON IN THE COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window