Financial history ODIHAM PRE-SCHOOL (LEAPFROGS)

Charity Number: 1060119
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £162.08k £185.93k £191.07k £193.87k £183.28k
Total expenditure £155.79k £169.51k £185.55k £187.12k £187.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £110.52k £142.88k £138.67k £130.01k £129.10k