SPRINGFIELDS FIRST SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for Springfields 1st School pupils
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 13 January 1997: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Jane Bagnall | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nina Harris | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Goodfellow | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lorraine Elizabeth Banks | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.49k | £2.06k | £3.68k | £2.31k | £2.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.81k | £3.35k | £3.27k | £1.10k | £3.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 March 2021 | 273 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF SPRINGFIELDS FIRST SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
YARNFIELD
STONE
STAFFORDSHIRE
ST15 0NJ
- Phone:
- 01785337310
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window