European Renal Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of medical knowledge by promoting scientific and clinical advances in the field of nephrology, dialysis, renal transplantation, hypertension & related subjects. The objectives are achieved by publishing journals, holding annual congresses, producing epidemiological data for research, organising educational courses, supporting fellowships and research, producing guidelines.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£7,957,604
Donations and legacies | £46.28k | |
Charitable activities | £4.18m | |
Other trading activities | £3.69m | |
Investments | £17.18k | |
Other | £30.19k |
Total expenditure:
£5,890,331
Raising funds | £216.05k | |
Charitable activities | £5.67m | |
Other | £0 |
£206,760 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £216.05k | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.67m | |
Retained for future use | £2.07m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £216.05k | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.67m | |
Retained for future use | £2.27m |
People

13 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Algeria
- Andorra
- Armenia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Bulgaria
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Egypt
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Greece
- Hungary
- Iceland
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Kazakhstan
- Kosovo
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Libya
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Malta
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Montenegro
- Morocco
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Russia
- San Marino
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Ukraine
Governance
- 14 January 1997: Standard registration
- EUROPEAN RENAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- EUROPEAN RENAL ASSOCIATION-EUROPEAN DIALYSIS AND TRANSPLANT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Maria Roser Torra Balcells | Chair | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Dimitrios Goumenos | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Kitty Jacoba Jager | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Susan Lees | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Mustafa Arici | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ana Carina da Costa Ferreira | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Giuseppe Grandaliano | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Dr. Pieter Andries Evenepoel | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Giovanni Gambaro | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Alberto Ortiz Arduan | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Panteleimon Sarafidis | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Albert Chee Meng Ong | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
PROF DANILO FLISER | Trustee | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.23m | £4.24m | £4.82m | £6.95m | £7.96m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.83m | £3.22m | £3.45m | £5.04m | £5.89m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £91.31k | £70.27k | £24.79k | £0 | £46.28k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £3.59m | £1.34m | £1.90m | £3.29m | £3.69m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.53m | £2.80m | £2.85m | £3.62m | £4.18m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £327 | £2 | £0 | £321 | £17.18k | |
|
Income - Other | £18.79k | £32.85k | £45.03k | £40.59k | £30.19k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.22m | £3.15m | £3.34m | £4.86m | £5.67m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £599.66k | £72.66k | £111.96k | £182.18k | £216.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £236.21k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £8.98k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £20.94k | £5.89k | £7.71k | £473.87k | £817.78k | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.33m | £2.40m | £2.90m | £2.72m | £2.85m | |
|
Other assets | £5.76m | £6.86m | £8.18m | £10.20m | £11.25m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £901.67k | £982.26k | £1.78m | £1.93m | £1.60m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/06/1996 AS AMENDED ON 02/06/2014 AS AMENDED ON 23 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED ON 05 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED ON 26 MAY 2018 as amended on 08 Jun 2020 as amended on 07 Jun 2021 as amended on 25 May 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL SCIENCE BY PROMOTING FUNDAMENTAL AND CLINICAL ADVANCES IN THE FIELD OF NEPHROLOGY, DIALYSIS, RENAL TRANSPLANTATION, HYPERTENSION, AND RELATED SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o PKF LITTLEJOHN
15 WESTFERRY CIRCUS
CANARY WHARF
LONDON
UNITED KINGDOM
E14 4HD
- Phone:
- +44(0)2075162274
- Email:
- secretariat@era-online.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window