Governing document European Renal Association
Charity number: 1060134

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/06/1996 AS AMENDED ON 02/06/2014 AS AMENDED ON 23 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED ON 05 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED ON 26 MAY 2018 as amended on 08 Jun 2020 as amended on 07 Jun 2021 as amended on 25 May 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL SCIENCE BY PROMOTING FUNDAMENTAL AND CLINICAL ADVANCES IN THE FIELD OF NEPHROLOGY, DIALYSIS, RENAL TRANSPLANTATION, HYPERTENSION, AND RELATED SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.