Trustees European Renal Association
Charity number: 1060134

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Maria Roser Torra Balcells | Chair | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Dimitrios Goumenos | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Kitty Jacoba Jager | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Susan Lees | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Mustafa Arici | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ana Carina da Costa Ferreira | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Giuseppe Grandaliano | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Dr. Pieter Andries Evenepoel | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Giovanni Gambaro | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Alberto Ortiz Arduan | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Panteleimon Sarafidis | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Albert Chee Meng Ong | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
PROF DANILO FLISER | Trustee | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.