Financial history BANGLADESHI ASSOCIATION [HARINGEY]

Charity Number: 1060146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.55k £1.52k £1.29k £520 £550
Total expenditure £3.43k £465 £380 £385 £370
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A