MARCUS GARVEY DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's current activities have been confined to an advisory role, with one of our project leaders based in Guyana (South America). The aim is to develop a community team to implement low cost housing projects. We are also making the necessary inquiries to build links between Further & Higher Educational Institutions in Britain & institutions in Guyana to build a Cyber library.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 May 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Blackpool
- Guyana
Governance
- 15 January 1997: Standard registration
- 09 November 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 November 2015: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANICE HAMILTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MR ALGY SEWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/05/2020 | 06/05/2021 | 06/05/2022 | 06/05/2023 | 06/05/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 May 2024 | 08 April 2025 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 May 2023 | 27 June 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 May 2022 | 27 June 2024 | 479 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 May 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 May 2020 | 21 May 2021 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 11TH AUGUST 1996.
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE IMPLEMENTING AND ESTBLISHING DEVELOPMENT PROJECT WHICH HELP TO ALLEVIATE NEED IN AFRICA AND AMERICAS
Area of benefit
AFRICA AND AMERICAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Broadview Road
London
SW16 5AU
- Phone:
- 02087643923
- Email:
- m_g_d_f@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window