Financial history SUNSHINE PRE-SCHOOL GROUP

Charity number: 1060160
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2010
Total gross income £45.55k £60.53k £61.69k £47.06k £54.61k
Total expenditure £44.45k £54.32k £64.29k £47.20k £55.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A