NORTHGATE AND PRUDHOE NHS TRUST CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1060164
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity funds and supports a wide rage of charitable and health related activities benefiting patients of Northgate and Prudhoe Hospital. The fund purchases a variety of additional goods and services that the NHS is unable to provide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007

Total income: £109,917
Total expenditure: £87,896

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 July 1997: Standard registration
  • 14 August 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 14 August 2009: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • NORTHUMBERLAND TYNE & WEAR NHS TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007
Total gross income £164.85k £77.37k £107.93k £109.92k
Total expenditure £199.23k £132.22k £138.01k £87.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 25 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 29 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 26 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/03/1997
Charitable objects
TO HELP RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROVIDE THERAPY TO PATIENTS AND RESIDENTS AT NORTHGATE AND PRUDHOE NHS TRUST BY A) ENHANCING THE ENVIRONMENT OF THE HOSPITAL BY THE PROVISION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THERAPEUTIC PROGRAMMES CONNECTED WITH THE ARTS AND THE PROVISION OF ARTWORK. B) ENCOURAGING PATIENTS AND RESIDENTS TO PARTICIPATE IN SUCH PROGRAMMES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 31 July 1997 : Standard registration
  • 14 August 2009 : Removed
  • 14 August 2009 : Asset transfer out