Trustees DANCING EYE SYNDROME SUPPORT TRUST
Charity number: 1060181

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Sarah Brazier | Chair | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vennetta Rheanne Mansell | Trustee | 25 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Allaway | Trustee | 25 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Arden Grummitt | Trustee | 28 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Hallcup | Trustee | 28 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Grummitt | Trustee | 28 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Ejaz | Trustee | 24 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ming Lim | Trustee | 18 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Morag Macleod | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Janet Compston | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.