PWLLHELI AND PENLLYN UNIT 603 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity Number: 1060195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Shorebased activities in line with Sea Cadet Corp regulations. Waterbased sailing and powerboating training and competancy certification.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,300
Total expenditure: £4,712

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Gwynedd

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 January 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • T S GLENDOWER (Working name)
  • T.S. ADRIAN (Working name)
  • PWLLHELI AND PENLLYN SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MALCOLM BLACKBURN Chair
None on record
MR CHRIS KINGMARTIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.64k £1.13k £5.72k £5.97k £5.30k
Total expenditure £9.37k £754 £2.04k £6.14k £4.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 April 2024 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BRYN CETHIN FAWR
ABERSOCH
PWLLHELI
LL53 7UL
Phone:
01758712196
Website:

No information available