THE MALVERN MASONIC CHARITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 January 1997: Standard registration
- MALVERN MASONIC CHARITY TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR KENNETH THOMAS HILL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kenneth Henry James Holtom | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philip Stephen Robinson | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Darran Phillips | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jason Paul White | Trustee | 31 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.29k | £2.41k | £2.05k | £3.18k | £4.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.07k | £676 | £1.10k | £2.09k | £4.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 DECEMBER 1996, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05 SEP 2021
Charitable objects
THE SUPPORT OF THE CHARITIES, OTHER CHARITIES REGISTERED WITH THE CHARITY COMMISSION, AND THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HEALTH OF RESIDENTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN LRELAND BY GIFT AND SUBSCRIPTIONS TO BE PAID TO THE TRUSTEES BY MEMBERS OF THE LODGES OR BY ANY SUBSCRIBING MEMBER OF ANY MASONIC LODGE MEETING IN THE PROVINCE OF WORCESTERSHIRE AND TO THIS ENDTHE TRUSTEES MAY ACQUIRE PERSONAL PROPERTY OF ANY NATURE AND SHALL APPLY THE SAME AND THE INCOME THEREOF FOR OR TOWARDS ALL OF THE PURPOSES HEREINAFTER MENTIONED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHARITIES, OTHER CHARITIES REGISTERED WITH THE CHARITY COMMISSION, AND THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HEALTH OF RESIDENTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN LRELAND AS FOLLOWS:- A LN MAKING DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS OR LOANS TO THE CHARITIES, OTHER CHARITIES REGISTERED WITH THE CHARITY COMMISSION, AND THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HEALTH OF RESIDENTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN LRELAND EITHER DIRECTLY, OR THROUGH THE LODGES CHARITY ACCOUNTS B GENERALLY IN THE UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES PROVIDING FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND FURTHERANCE OF THE INTERESTS OF THE CHARITIES, OTHER CHARITIES REGISTERED WITH THE CHARITY COMMISSION, AND THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HEALTH OF RESIDENTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN LRELAND C DOING ALL SUCH THINGS AS MAY IN LAW BE CHARITABLE AS ARE NECESSARY FOR THE PURPOSES AFORESAID OR ANY OF THEM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Masonic Hall
42 Belle Vue Terrace
MALVERN
WR14 4PZ
- Phone:
- 01684893490
- Email:
- malvern-mct@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window