Accounts and annual returns THE ACTIVITIES, CHILDCARE AND EDUCATION CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1060208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 April 2024 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 April 2024 90 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window