THE ACTIVITIES, CHILDCARE AND EDUCATION CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide facilities for daycare, recreation and education of children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £35,495 from 6 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 17 January 1997: Standard registration
- The ACE Centre (Working name)
- THE ACE CHILDREN'S CENTRE (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Purssell | Chair | 10 June 2019 |
|
|||||
ELISABETH HUTCHINGS | Trustee | 06 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID QUICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £285.99k | £262.56k | £269.15k | £276.46k | £271.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £298.22k | £278.60k | £275.33k | £270.84k | £296.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.21k | £44.10k | £29.82k | £35.53k | £35.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/12/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/06/2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BURFORD ROAD
CHIPPING NORTON
OXON
OX7 5DZ
- Phone:
- 01608644440
- Email:
- office@cnacecentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window