THE BIVOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bivol Trust provides skills development and social opportunities to young people with learning and accompanying physical disabilities aged 12 years to 60 years. It achieves these aims through running groups, some of which are social in nature and take in up to 21 young people, others are based on specific skills and have a focus on music, singing, and art and craft.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 17 January 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bethney Marie Franklin | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Alexander Christian Merrett | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Joseph Gerrard Paddon | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Rose King | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Turner | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH JANE EDWARDS | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
AIDAN EUGENE MOLLOY | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.96k | £24.34k | £33.43k | £47.48k | £42.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.08k | £18.84k | £28.55k | £39.43k | £34.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 NOVEMBER 1996 as amended on 23 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY - IN ORPHANAGES AND CHILDREN'S HOMES IN SALAJ, ROMANIA BY THE PROVISION OF AID. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN HAMPSHIRE, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED, BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING, WORK SKILLS, WORK EXPERIENCE AND TRAINING IN PERSONAL AND SOCIAL SKILLS.
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE, SALAJ COUNTY, ROMANIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Keith House
Kent Street
Portsea
Portsmouth
PO1 3BU
- Phone:
- 07903 648629
- Email:
- m_paddon@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window