FRIENDS OF CHELSEA CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Objects of FCCHS: The provision of education for young people admitted to C&W, The Royal Brompton, St. Mary's, Collingham Child & Family Unit, Lavender Walk Adolescent Unit, Bayswater Children's Centre & any children & young people who are unable to attend school due to medical or a mental health diagnosis also to support the education of students returning to their home Community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- City Of Westminster
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 20 January 1997: Standard registration
- F C C H S (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Manley | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jane Yacoub | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MS SUSAN BROWNE | Trustee | 18 November 2008 |
|
|
||||
JANETTE STEEL | Trustee | 17 December 1996 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.93k | £40.28k | £20.69k | £100.19k | £51.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.19k | £32.91k | £30.43k | £81.23k | £30.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 March 2023 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH DECEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED 14 NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE ATTENDING THE CHELSEA AND WESTMINSTER HOSPITAL, THE ROYAL BROMPTON HOSPITAL AND THE COLLINGHAM GARDENS AND THE PSYCHIATRIC UNIT.
Area of benefit
KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHELSEA & WESTMINSTER HOSPITAL
369 FULHAM ROAD
LONDON
SW10 9NH
- Phone:
- 02033158672
- Email:
- friends@cchs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window