DISASTER DOG GROUP (CASUALTY SEARCH DOGS)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Canine SAR. Providing dog teams free of charge throughout the UK for use by the emergency services. Also providing training for volunteer dog handlers who wish to become proficient in open-area searching; building and structural searching; building collapse; water and cadaver searching. We also welcome persons who wish to train as support personnel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 January 1997: Standard registration
- 12 July 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- CASUALTY SEARCH DOGS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MARCH 1996 AS AMENDED 30 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
1) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HUMAN LIFE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE FOREGOING BY ASSISTING THE EMERGENCY SERVICES IN SEARCHING FOR MISSING,LOST OR TRAPPED PERSONS 2) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HEALTH,CARE,MANAGEMENT AND TRAINING OF DOGS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window