HARMAN HOUSE COUNSELLING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide low cost professional counselling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Barking And Dagenham
- Havering
- Redbridge
Governance
- 20 January 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicole Green | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Maydell | Trustee | 17 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA JANE DULWICH | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN FEINSON | Trustee | 15 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
LISA RUTH JOSEPH | Trustee | 14 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE DENISE SMITH | Trustee | 11 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
FRANK WISEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.21k | £31.81k | £55.32k | £243.77k | £32.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.26k | £43.11k | £47.60k | £53.54k | £58.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 February 2023 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 February 2023 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/5/96
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE EXTENSION OF THE CHURCH'S HEALING MINISTRY TO PROVIDE A COUNSELLING SERVICE BASED AT HARMAN HOUSE, VALENCE AVENUE, DAGENHAM AND SERVING PRIMARILY THE POPULATIONS OF THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF BARKING AND DAGENHAM, HAVERING AND REDBRIDGE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Harman House
341 Valence Avenue
DAGENHAM
RM8 3RA
- Phone:
- 02085977686
- Email:
- harman.house@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window