DAVID NICHOLLS MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gives support to, and organizes, lectures on theology and the Caribbean; supports the David Nicholl Memorial Library, Regents Park College, Oxford; and makes bequests in support of student research on the Caribbean.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 20 January 1997: Standard registration
- DNMT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR Katherine Quinn | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Lambert | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Groves | Trustee | 18 April 2011 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR COLIN CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR. DAVID HOWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev NICHOLAS WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/06/2020 | 26/06/2021 | 26/06/2022 | 26/06/2023 | 26/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.63k | £478 | £548 | £548 | £5.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.47k | £1.51k | £1.92k | £2.26k | £2.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 June 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 June 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 June 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A LIBRARY AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF BURSARIES TO FACILITATE STUDY IN THE SAME AND GENERALLY TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE AND AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kellogg College
60-62 Banbury Road
Oxford
OX2 6PN
- Phone:
- 07980949780
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window