CLOPTON NURSERY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of children under the statutory school age, and provide out of school hours daily care facilities for pupils of the Thomas Jolyffe Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £40,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 20 January 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Alexander | Chair | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Monkton | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hopkins | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Dunnico | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £373.89k | £373.35k | £366.83k | £366.83k | £493.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £340.90k | £380.99k | £363.12k | £353.37k | £455.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £40.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 DECEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER THE STATUTORY SCHOOL AGEAND IN PARTICULAR THOSE CHILDREN WHO HOPE TO ATTEND THE THOMAS JOLYFFE PRIMARY SCHOOL. 2)PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE ,RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF SUCH CHILDREN AND OTHER PUPILS OF THOMAS JOLYFFE PRIMARY SCHOOL DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clopton Nursery
Clopton Road
Stratford-upon-Avon
Stratford-upon-Avon
Warwickshire
CV37 6TE
- Phone:
- 01789269360
- Email:
- office@cloptonnursery.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window