Financial history HAYLING ISLAND SAIL TRAINING TRUST

Charity number: 1060254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.05k £2.87k £4.27k £13.05k £11.01k
Total expenditure £2.99k £2.76k £2.64k £14.08k £11.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A