HAYLING ISLAND SAIL TRAINING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
102 Education/Training 194 Disability 110 Sport/Recreation Assisting children and people with special needs through water based activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 20 January 1997: Standard registration
- H I S T T (Working name)
- HISTT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM GEORGE TITE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rebecca Kent | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Bryan Nicholls | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Tuttle | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTABEL JANE BLAYDES | Trustee |
|
||||||
ZYGMUNT KRUK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.05k | £2.87k | £4.27k | £13.05k | £11.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.99k | £2.76k | £2.64k | £14.08k | £11.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JUNE 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 JANUARY 1997 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12 OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT OF PERSONS WHO ARE YOUNG, DISABLED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY) THROUGH SAILING AND OTHER WATERSPORTS AND RELATED ACTIVITIES. 2) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE WHO PARTICIPATE IN THEM TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR SAILING AND OTHER WATERSPORTS AND RELATED ACTIVITIES AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OF ALL LEVELS OF ABILITY. 3) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY TO CARRY OUT WORKS FOR THE REPAIR AND PRESERVATION OF THE SEA DEFENCES AT SANDY POINT, HAYLING ISLAND.
Area of benefit
HAYLING ISLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Kings Road
HAYLING ISLAND
Hampshire
PO11 0PD
- Phone:
- 07920775864
- Email:
- michael@masseyfamily.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window