DISABLED ADVENTURE CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide advice, organise holiday outings and social activities, and to encourage integration with all creeds, ages, all disabilities and non disabled, regardless of race, sex, age, colour, religious or political opinions, or sexuality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 21 January 1997: Standard registration
- 02 November 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- D A C (Working name)
- LEICESTERSHIRE DISABLED ADVENTURE CLUB (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.72k | £20.05k | £7.27k | £8.22k | £3.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.19k | £20.22k | £7.15k | £6.80k | £3.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 14 December 2016 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 30 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 20 November 2014 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED 15 APRIL 2000
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY PHYSICAL OR LEARNING DISABILITY IN THE BRITISH ISLES IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO TAKE HOLIDAYS.
Area of benefit
BRITISH ISLES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window