Financial history KNAPHILL CHURCHES TRUST

Charity number: 1060278
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2010 31/10/2011 31/10/2012 31/10/2013 30/11/2014
Total gross income £77.19k £83.47k £66.98k £60.78k £0
Total expenditure £81.71k £66.66k £69.78k £62.18k £13
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A