Accounts and annual returns ABERHOSAN VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1060296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 April 2024 06 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 14 April 2023 06 August 2024 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 14 April 2022 07 April 2023 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 14 April 2021 17 March 2022 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 14 April 2020 26 March 2021 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2020 Not Required