BRITISH JAZZ FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 January 1997: Standard registration
- 15 August 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BJF (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.52k | £9.91k | £15.00k | £0 | £9.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.79k | £9.57k | £15.71k | £0 | £6.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 28 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 11 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 OCTOBER 1996 AND AMENDED 13 JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROMOTING, ENCOURAGING AND INCREASING THE PUBLICS APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF BRITISH JAZZ MUSIC. ALSO IN THE RAISING OF FUNDS FOR THE BENEFIT OF SICK JAZZ MUSICIANS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window