Financial history NICE TIME

Charity Number: 1060306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 17/05/2020 16/05/2021 15/05/2022 14/05/2023 12/05/2024
Total gross income £756.20k £288.19k £846.82k £870.15k £870.49k
Total expenditure £739.02k £546.39k £643.99k £716.02k £814.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £51.51k £187.54k £33.24k £2.51k £3.11k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £145.83k N/A £135.85k £158.38k £158.95k
Income - Charitable activities £557.79k N/A £668.79k £703.51k £705.93k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.07k N/A £190 £4.14k £2.50k
Income - Other £51.51k N/A £41.99k £4.11k £3.11k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £625.36k N/A £536.91k £594.73k £700.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds £113.66k N/A £107.08k £121.28k £114.23k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £2.25k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0