GRACE FLORA RANDALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees make grant to pupils and former pupils of Rugby High School, Rugby going on to further education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 23 January 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Horton | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Ann Jones | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER STUART PRATT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.38k | £1.46k | £1.19k | £1.15k | £276.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £535 | £2.29k | £1.20k | £2.13k | £10.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 DECEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TOWARDS THE INITIAL EXPENCES OF PUPILS OR FORMER PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL GOING TO A UNIVERSITY OR POLYTECHNIC OR SUCH OTHER ESTABLISHMENT OR FURTHER EDUCATION AS MAY BE APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES AND IN OTHERWISE FURTHERING THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS IN SUCH MANNER AND AT SUCH TIMES AND ON SUCH CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brethertons
Franklins House
Manorsfield Road
BICESTER
Oxfordshire
OX26 6EX
- Phone:
- 01295270999
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window