FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS CHURCH, SHILLINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian Religion, in particular by assisting with the restoration, improvement and maintenance of the fabric of All Saints' Church, Shillington.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 23 January 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew William Gibbs | Chair | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Higgs | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Fletcher | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Robertson | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Karen Gibbs | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Scleater | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE ANNE BRETTELL | Trustee | 17 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Clare Siobhan RICHMOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Peter John FARMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Derek Godfrey LEWISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.54k | £8.25k | £27.56k | £22.99k | £30.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.22k | £2.81k | £33.61k | £33.48k | £16.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 12TH DECEMBER 1996, AMENDED 30TH APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING WITH THE RESTORATION, IMPROVEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF ALL SAINTS CHURCH, SHILLINGHAM.
Area of benefit
SHILLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Vicarage Close
Shillington
HITCHIN
Hertfordshire
SG5 3LS
- Phone:
- 01462711398
- Email:
- jjsk@supanet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window