THE FULWOOD TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to support biblical ministry and to provide money for training for biblical ministry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 January 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Carol Lockwood | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jonathan William Dyer | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Peter Norgate | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eric Paul German | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180 | £100 | £50.02k | £65 | £76.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £240 | £87 | £90 | £30.81k | £44.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 MAY 1996 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 7 JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF EVANGELICAL CHRISTIANITY AND THE WORSHIP OF THE GOD OF THE BIBLE AND THE SPREADING OF THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST.FOR FULL OBJECT DETAILSCLAUSE CLAUSE 3 OF THE DEED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 CHORLEY DRIVE
SHEFFIELD
S10 3RR
- Phone:
- 0114 2301911
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window