Trustees PETERSFIELD UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity Number: 1060354

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Price | Chair | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tim Willans | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Titian Fleming | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Challen | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Noonan | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bernice O'Reilly | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Stephens | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gregor Cumming | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lake | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Thwaites | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.