SHREE SWAMINARAYAN SIDHANT SAJIVAN MANDAL KUM KUM (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity ('the objects') are to advance the faith of Swaminarayan as perfectly explained by Shreejee Sankalpa Swarup Abji Bapa Shree, according to the tenets and practices established by Shreejee Sankalp Sadguru Shree Muktajivan Swamibapa ('the Founder') and as practiced by such of the followers of the Founder as acknowledge by Mahant Shastri Shree Harikrishna Swamishree
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 January 1997: Standard registration
- 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 February 2009: Standard registration
- SHRI SWAMINARAYAN GADI (Previous name)
- SHRI SWAMINARAYAN GADI SIDDHANT COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- SHRI SWAMINARAYAN GADI SIDDHANT SAMITTEE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JADVA NARAN HIRANI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
VALJI VARSANI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.57k | £27.75k | £25.85k | £40.95k | £43.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.94k | £15.51k | £7.46k | £29.25k | £20.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 DECEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED 17 JANUARY 1997 AND BY ORDER OF THE HIGH COURT DATED 05 JUNE 2003 (INCLUDING CONSTITUTION WITHIN THE SECOND SCHEDULE)
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE FAITH OF SWAMINARAYAN AS PERFECTLY EXPLAINED BY SHREEJEE SANKALP SWARUP ABJI BAPA SHREE, ACCORDING TO THE TENETS AND PRACTICES ESTABLISHED BY SHRIJI SANKALP SADGURU SHRI MUKTAJIVANDASJI SWAMIBAPA (THE FOUNDER) AND AS PRACTISED BY SUCH OF THE FOLLOWERS OF THE FOUNDER AS ACKNOWLEDGE SADGURU SHRI ANAND PRIYADASJI SWAMI AND THOSE APPOINTED BY THE SAID SADGURU SHRI ANAND PRIYADASJI SWAMI OR HIS SUCCESSORS TO BE THEIR SPRITUAL LEADERS BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (1) PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING ONE OR MORE TEMPLES IN THE UK FOR WORSHIP, THE DUE PERFORMANCE OF THE RITES AND CEREMONIES OF THE FAITH BY ADHERENTS OF THE FAITH AND EDUCATION OF ADHERENTS OF THE FAITH AND OTHERS IN THE TENETS, PRACTICES, RITES AND CEREMONIES OF THE FAITH (2) PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING FACILITIES ANCILLARY TO SUCH TEMPLES INCLUDING RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR ONE OR MORE PRIESTS OF THE FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 9 & 10
Honeypot Business Centre
Parr Road
Stanmore
Middlesex
HA71NL
- Phone:
- 02032980040
- Email:
- ssssmandalkumkumuk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window