Financial history ROCHDALE AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1060374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.45k £9.11k £15.87k £2.09k £4.06k
Total expenditure £2.38k £6.84k £5.04k £16.87k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A