PRO-SIBS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 January 1997: Standard registration
- 16 August 2005: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 16 August 2005: Funds transferred to 1018963 THE ADOLESCENT AND CHILDREN'S TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £932.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £840.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | 01 August 2005 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | 10 March 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH JULY 1996, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 10TH JANUARY 1997, 5 JUNE 1997, 10 SEPTEMBER 1997 AND 28 JUNE 2001.
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF BIRTH AND 12 WHO BY REASON OF THEIR CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE A NEED OF FOSTER OR SUBSTITUTE CARE; (B) TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION; TO ASSIST YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE BEEN LIVING IN CARE TO MOVE FROM CARE INTO LIVING INDEPENDENTLY IN A STABLE A FASHION AS POSSIBLE .
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window